USA v. Rosa
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00125 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
05/21/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
38
06/06/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
39
06/12/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
40
06/19/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
41
06/19/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
42
06/19/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
43
06/19/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
44
06/25/2018
Notice (Other)
06/26/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
06/29/2018
Judgment
48
06/29/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
49
07/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
07/03/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
07/05/2018
Amended Judgment
52
07/05/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.