USA v. Rosario et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00047 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
297
05/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
298
05/25/2018
Report and Recommendation - Final
299
05/29/2018
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
301
05/29/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
302
05/30/2018
Plea Agreement
303
05/30/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
304
05/30/2018
Notice (Other)
05/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
308
07/08/2018
Continue
07/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
310
08/24/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
08/30/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
315
09/11/2018
Unopposed Motion
316
09/13/2018
Warrant Returned Unexecuted
09/13/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
319
09/28/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
10/04/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
330
10/25/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
331
10/30/2018
Violation Disposition Report
332
11/05/2018
Memorandum
333
11/05/2018
Notice (Other)
334
11/06/2018
Unopposed Motion
335
11/06/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
336
11/06/2018
Notice (Other)
11/06/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
340
11/13/2018
Judgment on Revocation
341
11/13/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
342
11/23/2018
Notice (Other)
343
12/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
344
12/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
345
12/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
346
12/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.