USA v. Rose - Jared Rose
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2009-cr-00304 (ared)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 185 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/08/2009
MOTION to Seal Indictment by USA as to Jared Rose
2
10/08/2009
ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal Indictment as to Jared Rose (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/8/2009. (lmr) Modified on 10/13/2009 to correct filing date (lmr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2009:)
3
10/08/2009
INDICTMENT as to Jared Rose (1) counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 (lmr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2009:)
10/15/2009
INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Jared Rose, pursuant to instructions from chambers. (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/16/2009
MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Jared Rose
6
10/16/2009
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Jared Rose (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/16/2009.
10/16/2009
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Jared Rose for 10/20/2009 (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/20/2009
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit (sealed) by Jared Rose
8
10/20/2009
ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jared Rose: Lisa G. Peters appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/20/2009.
9
10/20/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Initial Appearance, Plea & Arraignment as to Jared Rose (1) Counts 1,2,3,4,5 held on 10/20/2009; not guilty plea entered by defendant on Counts 1-5.(ERO S. Flippen.)
10
10/20/2009
ORDER TO LODGE DETAINER as to Jared Rose. The U.S. Marshal shall file a Detainer with the appropriate custodial authority which, along with this Order, shall constitute a hold on the above-named defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/20/2009.
11
10/20/2009
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jared Rose: Jury Trial set for 11/30/2009 09:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody
12
10/20/2009
PRETRIAL DISCOVERY ORDER in case as to Jared Rose. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/20/2009.
13
10/22/2009
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/20/2009 in case as to Jared Rose.
14
10/28/2009
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Karen D. Whatley appearing for USA.
15
11/05/2009
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed on 10/20/2009 as to Jared Rose.
16
11/19/2009
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Jury Trial by Jared Rose
17
11/20/2009
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Jared Rose. Jury Trial set for 3/22/2010 09:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody. Time excluded from 11/20/09 until 3/22/10. Motion terminated : 16 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Jury Trial filed by Jared Rose. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/20/09.
18
01/06/2010
MOTION for Bond Hearing by Jared Rose
19
01/11/2010
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by USA as to Jared Rose
20
01/11/2010
NOTICE OF HEARING in case as to Jared Rose re: 18 MOTION for Bond : Bond Hearing set for 1/14/2010 10:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Magistrate Judge Beth Deere
21
01/14/2010
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Jared Rose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/14/2010.
22
01/14/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Beth Deere: Bond Hearing as to Jared Rose held on 1/14/2010; denying 18 Motion for Bond (ERO S. Flippen.)
23
01/19/2010
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)ORDER granting 19 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Assistant U.S. Attorney Anne E. Gardner is relieved and Assistant U.S. Attorney Stephanie Mazzanti, is substituted as counsel for the government. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/19/10.
01/19/2010
Attorney update in case as to Jared Rose. Attorney Anne E. Gardner terminated, pursuant to 23 Order granting motion to substitute counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/23/2010
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING as to Jared Rose set for 3/12/2010 at 1:30 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody
25
02/24/2010
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING as to Jared Rose reset for 3/11/2010 at 11:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody (previously set 3/12/2010 @ 1:30 PM)
26
03/11/2010
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody: Change of Plea Hearing as to Jared Rose held on 3/11/2010, Plea entered by Jared Rose (1) Guilty Count 1; counts 2-5 dismissed. Stephanie Mazzanti for USA; Lisa Peters for Deft; Karen Calhoun USPO. (Court Reporter Karen Baker.)
27
03/11/2010
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Jared Rose.
28
03/11/2010
PLEA AGREEMENT ADDENDUM (under seal) re 27 Plea Agreement.
29
04/19/2010
PRELIMINARY ORDER DIRECTING FORFEITURE OF PROPERTY as to Jared Rose. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/19/2010. Certified copy to USMS.
30
04/21/2010
NOTICE OF SENTENCING HEARING as to Jared Rose set for 5/26/2010 at 2:30 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody
31
05/26/2010
SENTENCING HEARING held before Judge James M. Moody on 5/26/2010 for Jared Rose (1). JUDGMENT: Count 1, 212 MONTHS Imprisonment (200 months plus 12 months for violation 21 USC 860a); 4 years supervised release; no fine; restitution in the amount of $1,391.50; $100 special penalty assessment. Forfeiture included. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USMS. AUSA - Stephanie Mazzanti; Defendant - Lisa Peters; USPO - Karen Calhoun; Court Reporter - Elaine Hinson (dmj) Modified on 5/27/2010 to correct typo error
32
05/26/2010
JUDGMENT as to Jared Rose (1), Count 1, 212 MONTHS imprisonment (200 months plus 12 months for violation 21 USC 860a); 4 years supervised release; no fine; restitution in the amount of $1,391.50; $100 special penalty assessment. Forfeiture included. Counts 2, 3, 4, 5, were dismissed on government's motion. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/26/2010.
34
05/26/2010
Sealed Document
35
07/21/2010
TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing Hearing Proceedings as to Jared Rose held on May 26, 2010 before Judge James M. Moody. Court Reporter Elaine Hinson. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 8/2/2010. Redaction Request due 8/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2010.
36
08/02/2010
Judgment Returned Executed as to Jared Rose on 7/21/2010.
37
09/21/2010
NOTICE Declaration of Publication by USA as to Jared Rose
38
09/21/2010
MOTION for Forfeiture of Property by USA as to Jared Rose
39
09/21/2010
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Jared Rose. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/21/2010. Certified copy to USMS.
40
10/01/2010
AMENDED FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Jared Rose. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/2010. Certified Copy to USMS.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.