USA v. Sadler
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00122-60894 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
10/17/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
6
10/17/2018
Indictment - For Public
7
10/17/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
8
10/17/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
10/17/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
10/29/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/02/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
15
11/02/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
16
11/02/2018
Order of Detention
17
11/15/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
18
11/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
19
11/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
01/29/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
01/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
01/29/2019
Plea Agreement
30
01/29/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
02/19/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
01/29/2019
Errata
34
02/22/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
35
02/25/2019
Forfeiture of Property
36
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
37
03/07/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
38
03/18/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
04/11/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
41
04/26/2019
Continue
42
04/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
43
04/26/2019
Declaration
04/26/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.