USA v. Saechao et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00159 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
71
05/25/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
72
06/01/2018
Response in Opposition
73
06/13/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
74
06/14/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
06/21/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
77
06/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
07/02/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
80
07/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
81
07/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
82
07/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
83
07/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
84
07/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
85
07/18/2018
Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
07/23/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Docket Annotation re Supplemental Briefing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
08/06/2018
Notice (Other)
90
08/09/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
08/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
08/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/21/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
98
08/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
99
08/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
100
08/24/2018
Statement
101
08/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
102
08/24/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
103
08/25/2018
Withdraw Document
104
08/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
08/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
08/28/2018
Order
108
08/29/2018
Supplement
109
08/29/2018
Notice (Other)
110
08/29/2018
Unopposed Motion
112
08/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
116
09/04/2018
Judgment
117
09/04/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
09/04/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Judgment (Text entry; no document attached.)
119
09/14/2018
Judgment
120
09/14/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.