USA v. Saelee et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00117-60803 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
55
02/01/2019
Additional Related Document
56
02/01/2019
Notice (Other)
57
02/01/2019
Notice (Other)
58
02/01/2019
Notice (Other)
59
02/04/2019
Notice (Other)
02/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
02/22/2019
Order
62
02/24/2019
Modify Conditions of Release
02/28/2019
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
02/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
02/28/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
03/07/2019
Status Report
03/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
05/23/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.