USA v. Saelee et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00117-60804 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
26
09/21/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
27
09/21/2018
Indictment - For Public
09/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
09/24/2018
Summons Returned Executed
32
09/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
09/25/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
09/25/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
09/25/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
09/25/2018
Order of Detention
37
09/25/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
38
10/10/2018
Additional Related Document
39
10/13/2018
Continue
40
10/13/2018
Continue
10/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
11/16/2018
Clerks Notice
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
12/01/2018
Modify Conditions of Release
12/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
12/05/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
12/06/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
53
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
54
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
55
02/01/2019
Additional Related Document
56
02/01/2019
Notice (Other)
57
02/01/2019
Notice (Other)
58
02/01/2019
Notice (Other)
59
02/04/2019
Notice (Other)
02/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
02/22/2019
Order
64
02/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
67
03/07/2019
Status Report
03/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
04/01/2019
Substitute Attorney
04/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/03/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
05/15/2019
Status Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.