USA v. Saelee et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00464 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/30/2018
Complaint
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/31/2018
Pretrial Services Report
5
08/31/2018
Pretrial Services Report
8
09/03/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
9
09/04/2018
Vacate
10
09/04/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
09/04/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
09/04/2018
Order of Detention
09/04/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
09/04/2018
Order of Detention
16
09/05/2018
Order of Detention
22
09/10/2018
Bail Review Hearing
23
09/10/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
24
09/10/2018
Order of Release
25
09/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
09/21/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.