USA v. Sails
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00171 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
36
06/07/2018
Plea Agreement
37
06/07/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
06/25/2018
Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Bail Review Hearing
43
06/25/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
44
06/29/2018
Summons Returned Executed
45
06/29/2018
Notice (Other)
07/02/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
07/05/2018
Summons Returned Executed
08/02/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
08/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
08/02/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
08/03/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
08/03/2018
Order of Detention
55
08/08/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
56
08/09/2018
Forfeiture of Property
57
08/10/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
58
08/15/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
59
08/20/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
60
09/05/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
62
09/11/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
63
09/18/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
64
09/18/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
65
09/18/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
66
09/18/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
09/26/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
10/25/2018
Judgment
69
10/25/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
70
11/14/2018
Forfeiture of Property
71
11/14/2018
Affidavit
72
11/27/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.