USA v. Salazar-Cardenas
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00168 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
29
07/13/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
30
07/25/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
33
10/05/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
34
10/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
35
10/17/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
10/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.