USA v. Sambo Loewen
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00132-60904 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/18/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
10/18/2018
Indictment - For Public
10/19/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/24/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/26/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/26/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
8
10/26/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
9
10/26/2018
Order of Detention
10/31/2018
Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.