USA v. Sampo
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00143 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
50
05/23/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
51
05/23/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
52
05/23/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
53
05/30/2018
Continue
06/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
06/20/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
56
06/20/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
57
06/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
58
06/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
06/27/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
06/29/2018
Forfeiture of Property
62
06/29/2018
Affidavit
63
07/03/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
64
07/12/2018
Judgment
65
07/12/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.