USA v. Sanborn Loewen
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00012-60952 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
11/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/13/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/08/2019
Order
16
01/10/2019
Unopposed Motion
17
01/10/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
01/11/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
01/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/01/2019
Status Report
24
03/05/2019
Order
25
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
26
03/19/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
03/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
05/02/2019
Continue
05/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
05/15/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
36
05/15/2019
Expedite
37
05/15/2019
Declaration
05/16/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.