USA v. Sanders et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00066 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
05/25/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/30/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
06/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
06/05/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
06/05/2018
Notice (Other)
85
06/05/2018
Violation Disposition Report
86
06/06/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition
87
06/11/2018
Judgment on Revocation
88
06/11/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
89
06/13/2018
Amended Judgment on Revocation
90
06/13/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.