USA v. Sanjoyo
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00027 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
45
06/26/2018
Continue
06/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
06/29/2018
Forfeiture of Property
48
07/03/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
49
08/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
50
08/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/07/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
08/16/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
54
08/20/2018
Judgment
55
08/20/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
09/11/2018
Judgment (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
09/27/2018
Notice (Other)
57
09/27/2018
Return of Property/PostTrial
58
09/27/2018
Declaration
59
09/28/2018
Notice (Other)
10/04/2018
Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.