USA v. Santana-Pierna et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00002 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
671
06/11/2018
Order
672
07/02/2018
Notice (Other)
673
07/02/2018
Notice (Other)
674
08/01/2018
Evidentiary Hearing
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
676
08/09/2018
Evidentiary Hearing
08/09/2018
Docket Annotation re Supplemental Briefing (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.