USA v. Saofaga
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00129-60916 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/18/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
10/18/2018
Indictment - For Public
3
10/18/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
10/18/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
10/18/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/24/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
10/25/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
10
10/25/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
11
10/25/2018
Order of Detention
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/15/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
11/16/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/16/2018
Unopposed Motion
17
11/16/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
18
12/17/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
12/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
01/04/2019
Status Report
25
01/07/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
26
01/11/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
01/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
02/22/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
02/22/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/01/2019
Unopposed Motion
04/01/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.