USA v. Saunders et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00139-61004 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
3
11/20/2018
Pretrial Services Report
11/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
11/20/2018
Change Venue
9
11/20/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10
11/21/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11/27/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
11/27/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
14
11/27/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
15
11/27/2018
Order of Detention
16
11/27/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
17
11/27/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
18
11/27/2018
Order of Detention
19
11/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
20
11/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
21
12/12/2018
Status Report
22
12/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
12/19/2018
Pretrial Services Report
25
12/21/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Order on Motion for Change of Venue (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Order on Motion for Change of Venue (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.