USA v. Scharber et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00013 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
99
05/22/2018
Judgment
100
05/22/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
05/22/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
05/31/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
102
06/06/2018
Continue
06/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
104
06/12/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
105
07/03/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
106
07/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
107
07/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
108
07/10/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
109
07/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
110
07/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
111
07/12/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
07/17/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
114
07/20/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
115
07/20/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
116
07/23/2018
USCA Case Number
117
07/23/2018
USCA Time Schedule Order
118
07/24/2018
USCA Order
119
07/25/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
120
07/31/2018
Judgment
121
07/31/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
122
09/04/2018
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
123
09/04/2018
Designation of Record on Appeal
124
09/04/2018
Continue
126
10/04/2018
Transcript
127
10/04/2018
Transcript
128
10/04/2018
Transcript
129
10/04/2018
Transcript
130
10/04/2018
Transcript
131
10/15/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
132
10/15/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
133
10/15/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
134
10/15/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
10/23/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
137
10/26/2018
Judgment
138
10/26/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.