USA v. Schmidt
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00173 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
06/05/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
39
06/11/2018
Continue
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
07/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
09/04/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/11/2018
Order Referring Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
09/13/2018
Pretrial Services Report
48
09/17/2018
Bail Review Hearing
49
09/17/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
50
09/17/2018
Order of Release
51
10/11/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 Request No Action
52
10/12/2018
Order
53
10/25/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 Request for Modification
54
10/26/2018
Order
55
11/01/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 (DJ) - WOA
56
11/01/2018
Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (DJ) - WOA
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
11/05/2018
Order of Detention
11/05/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.