USA v. Schmoke
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00041-59543 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
06/01/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
06/04/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
06/06/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
41
06/06/2018
Order of Release
42
06/06/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 Request for Modification
43
06/07/2018
Order
06/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
06/26/2018
Plea Agreement
46
06/26/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/27/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
06/28/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
08/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
52
08/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
53
01/14/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.