USA v. Schuchman
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00095-60616 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/23/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
08/23/2018
Indictment - For Public
08/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/27/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
5
08/27/2018
Appoint Counsel
6
08/28/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
7
08/28/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
8
08/30/2018
Pretrial Services Report
9
08/31/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
08/31/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
08/31/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
12
08/31/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
14
09/13/2018
Notice (Other)
15
09/14/2018
Continue
09/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
25
10/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
26
10/22/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
10/22/2018
Notice of Arrest - Other District (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
10/22/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
28
10/23/2018
Notice (Other)
29
10/26/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
30
10/30/2018
Continue
31
11/01/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
32
11/19/2018
Unopposed Motion
33
11/19/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
34
12/04/2018
Order of Release
12/05/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
12/05/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
37
12/05/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
39
01/31/2019
Continue
02/01/2019
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
02/01/2019
Continue
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
02/07/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
02/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
02/19/2019
Modify Conditions of Release
02/20/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
02/20/2019
Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
48
02/28/2019
Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request for Modification
49
02/28/2019
Response in Opposition
50
02/28/2019
Order
51
03/04/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
03/05/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
03/27/2019
Status Report
58
04/18/2019
Petition for Action - PS8 (DJ) - Request No Action
59
04/19/2019
Order
05/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
05/24/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
62
05/24/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.