USA v. Schwier
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00095 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
81
05/20/2018
Continue
82
05/20/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
05/23/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
07/16/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
86
07/25/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
08/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
09/14/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
90
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
09/17/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
09/19/2018
Appear
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
09/21/2018
Notice (Other)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
97
09/28/2018
Notice (Other)
98
10/10/2018
Status Conference
99
11/06/2018
Additional Related Document
100
11/19/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 Request for Modification
101
11/19/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.