USA v. Schwier
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00095-58241 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
81
05/20/2018
Continue
82
05/20/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
05/23/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
07/16/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
86
07/25/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
08/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
09/14/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
90
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
09/17/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
09/19/2018
Appear
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
09/21/2018
Notice (Other)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
97
09/28/2018
Notice (Other)
98
10/10/2018
Status Conference
99
11/06/2018
Additional Related Document
100
11/19/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 Request for Modification
101
11/19/2018
Order
102
01/18/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/18/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
02/11/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
02/11/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
110
02/27/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
111
02/27/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
112
02/28/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
113
03/06/2019
Status Report
114
03/19/2019
Transcript
115
03/21/2019
In Limine
116
03/21/2019
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
117
03/21/2019
Indictment - For Public
03/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
119
03/25/2019
Trial Brief
120
03/25/2019
Proposed Voir Dire
121
03/25/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
03/25/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
124
03/26/2019
Notice (Other)
125
03/26/2019
Continue
03/27/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
127
04/22/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
128
04/22/2019
Compel
129
04/22/2019
Status Report
04/22/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
04/22/2019
Notice (Other)
132
04/22/2019
Response in Opposition
133
04/23/2019
Notice (Other)
04/23/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
135
04/24/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
136
04/24/2019
Transcript
137
04/25/2019
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
138
04/25/2019
Indictment - For Public
04/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
140
04/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
141
04/26/2019
Errata
142
04/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
143
04/30/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
144
04/30/2019
Expedite
04/30/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
148
05/03/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
149
05/03/2019
Expedite
150
05/06/2019
Compel
151
05/06/2019
Dismiss
152
05/06/2019
Dismiss
153
05/06/2019
Response in Opposition
154
05/06/2019
Expedite
05/07/2019
Case No Longer Referred (Text entry; no document attached.)
155
05/08/2019
Order on Motion to Compel
05/08/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
157
05/08/2019
Response in Opposition
158
05/09/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
05/09/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
160
05/13/2019
Response in Opposition
161
05/13/2019
Response in Opposition
162
05/13/2019
Notice (Other)
163
05/22/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
164
05/22/2019
Expedite
05/22/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.