USA v. Scott
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00116 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
21
05/25/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
05/29/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
05/30/2018
Plea Agreement
24
05/30/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/01/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
08/09/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
30
08/30/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
31
09/04/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
37
09/14/2018
Sentencing
38
09/14/2018
Witness List Public Doc
39
09/14/2018
Exhibit List
40
10/02/2018
Judgment
41
10/02/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
42
10/03/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.