USA v. Seley
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2019-cr-00001-61307 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
4
03/07/2019
Appear
03/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/07/2019
Pretrial Services Report
03/08/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
03/08/2019
Order
9
03/11/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
10
03/11/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
11
03/11/2019
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
12
03/19/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
03/19/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/20/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
04/12/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
04/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/20/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/20/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.