USA v. Seward
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00083-60460 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/18/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
07/18/2018
Indictment - For Public
3
07/18/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
07/18/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/21/2018
Pretrial Services Report
08/21/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
08/21/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
10
08/21/2018
Order of Detention
11
08/21/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
12
08/22/2018
Protective Order
13
08/22/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
14
08/22/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
15
08/23/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/09/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
10/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/10/2018
Information - Felony
20
10/11/2018
Plea Agreement
21
10/11/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
22
10/11/2018
Waiver of Indictment
10/11/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
11/23/2018
Forfeiture of Property
26
12/03/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
27
12/06/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
12/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
12/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
30
12/31/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
01/02/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
03/11/2019
Unopposed Motion
33
03/12/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion
05/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
05/21/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
36
05/21/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.