USA v. Shubart
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00028 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
128
05/21/2018
USCA Order
129
05/29/2018
Order
130
06/19/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
131
06/19/2018
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
132
07/03/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
133
08/30/2018
Statement
134
11/13/2018
USCA Order
11/27/2018
USCA Appeal Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.