USA v. Sida
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00169 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
29
06/07/2018
Plea Agreement
30
06/07/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/07/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
07/17/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
08/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
08/08/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
36
08/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
37
08/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
38
08/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
39
08/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/24/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
09/05/2018
Judgment
43
09/05/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.