USA v. Simpson
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2006-cr-00093 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
297
06/04/2018
Order - Sealed pdf
07/17/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
USPO Report re: Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
305
07/24/2018
Appear
306
07/24/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
07/25/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
308
07/25/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
309
07/25/2018
Notice (Other)
310
07/25/2018
Order of Detention
08/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
314
08/23/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
315
08/24/2018
Appear
08/24/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
320
08/30/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
323
09/25/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.