USA v. Skultka
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00006 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
05/30/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
06/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
09/17/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
10/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/25/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.