USA v. Skultka
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00006-59848 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
05/30/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
06/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
09/17/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
10/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/25/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
01/08/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
24
01/10/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/10/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
02/12/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/14/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
03/06/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
30
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
31
03/14/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
32
03/14/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
33
03/14/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
34
03/14/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
35
03/20/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.