USA v. Slather et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00115 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
74
05/23/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
75
05/23/2018
Plea Agreement
76
05/23/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
05/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
05/25/2018
Notice (Other)
80
06/11/2018
Continue
06/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
83
07/06/2018
Continue
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
07/17/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
86
07/24/2018
Continue
87
07/24/2018
Affidavit
07/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
08/08/2018
Continue
90
08/08/2018
Hearing
91
08/08/2018
Affidavit
92
08/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
08/15/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned to KFM (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
97
08/20/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
98
08/20/2018
Order of Release
09/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
102
09/25/2018
Continue
103
09/25/2018
Affidavit
09/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
105
11/04/2018
Continue
106
11/04/2018
Affidavit
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
109
11/08/2018
Continue
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.