USA v. Smith et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00049 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
139
06/12/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Bail Review Hearing
06/12/2018
Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
144
06/21/2018
Order of Release
145
06/21/2018
Order of Release
06/22/2018
Docket Annotation re Duplicate Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
147
06/22/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
148
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
151
09/20/2018
Notice (Other)
09/21/2018
Motions Referred (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
154
10/23/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
155
10/24/2018
Order
156
10/25/2018
Dismiss
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
158
10/29/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss
11/01/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.