USA v. Smith et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00086 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
168
06/19/2018
Notice of Intent to Seek Death Penalty
170
07/05/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
171
07/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
172
07/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
173
07/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
174
07/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
177
07/16/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
178
07/16/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
179
07/17/2018
Response in Opposition
180
07/17/2018
Appear
181
07/18/2018
Reply to Response
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
184
07/19/2018
Forfeiture of Property
185
07/19/2018
Affidavit
186
07/20/2018
Judgment
187
07/20/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
189
07/24/2018
Notice (Other)
190
07/24/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
192
07/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
211
09/28/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
10/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
218
10/23/2018
Notice (Other)
219
10/23/2018
Continue
10/24/2018
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
220
10/23/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
221
10/23/2018
Notice (Other)
227
11/05/2018
Appear
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
229
11/09/2018
Response in Opposition
230
11/09/2018
Declaration
234
11/13/2018
Reply to Response
235
11/15/2018
Motion Hearing
237
11/21/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
239
11/24/2018
Compel
241
12/06/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
242
12/07/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
243
12/07/2018
Response in Opposition
244
12/07/2018
Notice (Other)
245
12/09/2018
Reply to Response
246
12/10/2018
Response in Opposition
247
12/11/2018
Reply to Response
248
12/11/2018
Notice (Other)
249
12/11/2018
Status Conference
252
12/14/2018
Withdraw Document
253
12/14/2018
Response in Opposition
254
12/14/2018
Reply to Response

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.