USA v. Smith et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00086-55963 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
352
02/20/2019
ORDER RE: MOTION TO STRIKE ALL STATUTORY AND NON-STATUTORY AGGRAVATING FACTORS BECAUSE THEY WERE NOT FOUND BY THE GRAND JURY: denying 289 Motion as to John Pearl Smith II (1). (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 02/19/2019.
390
03/28/2019
ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE NON-STATUTORY AGGRAVATORS: IT IS ORDERED that the motion at Docket 292 is DENIED. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/27/2019.
396
04/01/2019
ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS 3, 4, 5, 6, 11, AND 15: HOBBS ACT CRIMES OF VIOLENCE: denying 300 Motion as to John Pearl Smith II (1). (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/01/2019.
397
04/01/2019
ORDER RE MOTION TO DECLARE THE FDPA UNCONSTITUTIONAL UNDER THE TENTH AMENDMENT: denying 361 Motion as to John Pearl Smith II (1). (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/01/2019.
398
04/01/2019
ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE VICTIM IMPACT EVIDENCE: denying 362 Motion as to John Pearl Smith II (1). (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/01/2019.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.