USA v. Smith et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00086-55964 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
304
01/24/2019
Leave to File Document
305
01/24/2019
Response in Opposition
306
01/24/2019
Declaration
311
01/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
348
02/12/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
362
02/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
363
02/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
376
03/13/2019
Notice (Other)
395
03/29/2019
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
421
05/15/2019
Compel

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.