USA v. Smith et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00086-55965 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
168
06/19/2018
Notice of Intent to Seek Death Penalty
170
07/05/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
171
07/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
172
07/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
173
07/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
174
07/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
177
07/16/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
178
07/16/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
179
07/17/2018
Response in Opposition
180
07/17/2018
Appear
181
07/18/2018
Reply to Response
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
184
07/19/2018
Forfeiture of Property
185
07/19/2018
Affidavit
186
07/20/2018
Judgment
187
07/20/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
189
07/24/2018
Notice (Other)
190
07/24/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
192
07/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
211
09/28/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
10/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
218
10/23/2018
Notice (Other)
219
10/23/2018
Continue
10/24/2018
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
220
10/23/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
221
10/23/2018
Notice (Other)
227
11/05/2018
Appear
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
229
11/09/2018
Response in Opposition
230
11/09/2018
Declaration
234
11/13/2018
Reply to Response
235
11/15/2018
Motion Hearing
237
11/21/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
239
11/24/2018
Compel
241
12/06/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
242
12/07/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
243
12/07/2018
Response in Opposition
244
12/07/2018
Notice (Other)
245
12/09/2018
Reply to Response
246
12/10/2018
Response in Opposition
247
12/11/2018
Reply to Response
248
12/11/2018
Notice (Other)
249
12/11/2018
Status Conference
252
12/14/2018
Withdraw Document
253
12/14/2018
Response in Opposition
254
12/14/2018
Reply to Response
258
12/17/2018
Amended Minute Entry
12/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
260
12/18/2018
Supplement
261
12/18/2018
Declaration
262
12/19/2018
Order
265
12/20/2018
Discovery
266
12/20/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
267
12/21/2018
Order
268
12/21/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
270
12/28/2018
Response in Opposition
271
12/31/2018
Response in Opposition
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
274
01/02/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
275
01/02/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
276
01/02/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
277
01/04/2019
Reply to Response
278
01/05/2019
Reply to Response
279
01/09/2019
Reply to Response
280
01/10/2019
Order
01/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/10/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
283
01/14/2019
Reply to Response
284
01/15/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
285
01/15/2019
Order
286
01/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
287
01/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
288
01/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
289
01/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
290
01/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
291
01/16/2019
Notice (Other)
292
01/17/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
293
01/17/2019
Continue
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
295
01/18/2019
Order on Motion to Compel
299
01/22/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
300
01/23/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
301
01/23/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
302
01/23/2019
Response in Opposition
304
01/24/2019
Leave to File Document
305
01/24/2019
Response in Opposition
306
01/24/2019
Declaration
307
01/24/2019
Order
308
01/24/2019
Notice (Other)
309
01/24/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
310
01/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
311
01/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
312
01/28/2019
Reconsideration
313
01/28/2019
Declaration
314
01/30/2019
Response in Opposition
315
01/30/2019
Response in Opposition
316
01/30/2019
Response in Opposition
317
01/30/2019
Response in Opposition
318
01/30/2019
Response in Opposition
320
01/31/2019
Order
326
02/04/2019
Order
327
02/04/2019
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
329
02/05/2019
Strike
02/05/2019
Order on Motion to Strike (Text entry; no document attached.)
333
02/06/2019
Response in Opposition
336
02/08/2019
Notice (Other)
337
02/10/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
338
02/10/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
339
02/11/2019
Response in Support
02/12/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
348
02/12/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
02/13/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
350
02/14/2019
Notice (Other)
351
02/20/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
352
02/20/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
354
02/21/2019
Notice (Other)
02/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
356
02/25/2019
Status Conference
359
02/26/2019
Order
360
02/26/2019
Order
361
02/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
362
02/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
363
02/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
364
03/01/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
365
03/01/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
370
03/08/2019
Continue
371
03/08/2019
Notice (Other)
372
03/08/2019
Notice (Other)
373
03/08/2019
Response in Opposition
03/12/2019
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
376
03/13/2019
Notice (Other)
377
03/14/2019
Response in Opposition
378
03/14/2019
Response in Opposition
379
03/14/2019
Response in Opposition
380
03/15/2019
Notice (Other)
381
03/15/2019
Errata
382
03/15/2019
Response in Opposition
383
03/15/2019
Response in Opposition
385
03/22/2019
Reply to Response
386
03/26/2019
Continue
388
03/27/2019
Notice (Other)
389
03/27/2019
Notice (Other)
390
03/28/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
391
03/28/2019
Order
392
03/28/2019
Notice (Other)
393
03/28/2019
Continue
394
03/28/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
395
03/29/2019
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
396
04/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
397
04/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
398
04/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
04/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
401
04/03/2019
Notice (Other)
402
04/06/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
403
04/09/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
404
04/10/2019
Response in Opposition
405
04/12/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
406
04/12/2019
Declaration
04/15/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
408
04/12/2019
Declaration
410
04/16/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
412
04/17/2019
Transcript
413
04/17/2019
Transcript
414
04/17/2019
Transcript
416
04/19/2019
Notice (Other)
417
04/19/2019
Notice (Other)
418
04/22/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
419
04/22/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
420
05/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
421
05/15/2019
Compel
422
05/16/2019
Dismiss
423
05/20/2019
Disclosure
424
05/20/2019
Errata

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.