USA v. Smith
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2014-cr-00002 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
88
09/13/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
09/20/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
09/20/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
91
09/20/2018
Notice (Other)
92
09/20/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
93
09/20/2018
Order of Release
09/24/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
10/25/2018
Order of Detention
103
11/13/2018
Appear
11/13/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.