USA v. Smith
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2014-cr-00002-50374 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
88
09/13/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
09/20/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
09/20/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
91
09/20/2018
Notice (Other)
92
09/20/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
93
09/20/2018
Order of Release
09/24/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
10/25/2018
Order of Detention
103
11/13/2018
Appear
11/13/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
12/13/2018
Status Report
12/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
109
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
03/12/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
03/18/2019
Violation Disposition Report
03/21/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
03/21/2019
Order of Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.