USA v. Smith
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00046 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
102
07/13/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
103
07/13/2018
Notice (Other)
104
07/13/2018
Order of Detention
07/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
07/23/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
107
07/24/2018
Violation Disposition Report
108
07/31/2018
Notice (Other)
08/01/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
110
08/16/2018
Judgment on Revocation
111
08/16/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.