USA v. Smith
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00112-60785 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/20/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
09/20/2018
Indictment - For Public
10/04/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/04/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/05/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/05/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
8
10/05/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
9
10/05/2018
Order of Detention
10
10/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
11
10/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
14
11/02/2018
Hearing
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/07/2018
Amended Pretrial Services Report
11/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/08/2018
Bail Review Hearing
11/15/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
12/11/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
27
12/11/2018
Order of Release
12/11/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
12/11/2018
Suppress
31
12/18/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
12/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
12/21/2018
Response in Opposition
37
01/07/2019
Continue
01/07/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
01/08/2019
Order
40
01/10/2019
Reconsideration
41
01/11/2019
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
42
01/11/2019
Unopposed Motion
43
01/11/2019
Status Report
01/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
01/14/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/14/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
01/18/2019
Transcript
51
02/07/2019
Hearing
52
02/07/2019
Notice (Other)
53
02/08/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing
54
03/01/2019
Status Report
55
03/05/2019
Order
56
03/06/2019
Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)
03/07/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
03/11/2019
Status Report
60
03/12/2019
Order
61
03/14/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/14/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
03/15/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
64
03/18/2019
Objection to Report and Recommendations
65
03/18/2019
Reply to Objection to Report and Recommendation
66
03/18/2019
Objection to Report and Recommendations
03/22/2019
Order on Report and Recommendations (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
03/22/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
03/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
04/02/2019
Plea Agreement
71
04/03/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/08/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
04/09/2019
Hearing
75
04/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
76
04/09/2019
Declaration
04/10/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
04/09/2019
Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request No Action
81
04/18/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
82
04/25/2019
Notice (Other)
83
05/06/2019
Modify Conditions of Release
84
05/06/2019
Expedite
85
05/06/2019
Declaration
05/07/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
05/07/2019
Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
88
05/23/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.