USA v. Smith
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00146-61022 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/16/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
11/16/2018
Indictment - For Public
11/16/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/16/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
11/16/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
11/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/19/2018
Pretrial Services Report
11/20/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
11/20/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
10
11/20/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
11
11/20/2018
Order of Detention
12
12/14/2018
Unopposed Motion
13
12/18/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/18/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
12/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/07/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
19
02/08/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
02/14/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
22
03/12/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/13/2019
Plea Agreement
25
03/13/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
03/20/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
04/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
29
04/08/2019
Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)
30
04/30/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
05/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
05/21/2019
Continue
33
05/21/2019
Response in Opposition
34
05/21/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
35
05/23/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
36
05/23/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.