USA v. Sorensen
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

3:2006-cr-00019 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
189
05/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
190
05/23/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
191
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
05/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
194
05/29/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
195
05/29/2018
Order of Detention
196
06/05/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
197
06/05/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
198
06/07/2018
Notice (Other)
06/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.