USA v. Sorensen
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00314 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/24/2018
Complaint
05/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
05/29/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
5
05/29/2018
Order of Detention
6
05/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
7
06/05/2018
Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.