USA v. Soriano
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00124 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
06/13/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
34
06/20/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/21/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
07/02/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/05/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
07/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
39
08/01/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
40
09/12/2018
Unopposed Motion
41
09/13/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
42
10/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
43
10/31/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
44
11/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
45
11/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
12/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.