USA v. Sprinkle
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00115-60790 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/20/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
09/20/2018
Indictment - For Public
11/26/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
11/27/2018
Pretrial Services Report
11/27/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/27/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
7
11/27/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
8
11/27/2018
Order of Detention
9
12/10/2018
Protective Order
10
12/11/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
11
12/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/18/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
14
12/19/2018
Bail Review Hearing
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/02/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/03/2019
Appear
01/03/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/08/2019
Order
22
01/24/2019
Appear
23
01/24/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
01/25/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
03/29/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
30
03/29/2019
Plea Agreement
31
03/29/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/08/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.