USA v. Sterling
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00135 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
06/04/2018
Plea Agreement
34
06/04/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/05/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
07/24/2018
Forfeiture of Property
39
07/25/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
40
08/02/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
41
08/23/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
42
08/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
43
08/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
44
08/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
45
08/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
09/13/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
09/14/2018
Judgment
49
09/14/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.