USA v. Stevens
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00463 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/30/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
08/30/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
08/30/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
3
08/30/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
08/30/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/31/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/04/2018
Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
09/04/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
9
09/04/2018
Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing
10
09/04/2018
Order of Detention
11
09/12/2018
Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
09/12/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
09/12/2018
Vacate
14
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
09/18/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
09/14/2018
Hearing
17
09/18/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/21/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
09/21/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
20
09/21/2018
Order of Release
21
10/03/2018
Notice (Other)
22
10/04/2018
Rule 20 - Transfer Out

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.