USA v. Steward
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00052-59865 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
05/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
15
05/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
05/25/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
07/30/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
07/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
08/03/2018
Plea Agreement
24
08/03/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
08/10/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/03/2018
Errata
29
09/14/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
30
10/05/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
31
10/15/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
32
10/15/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
33
10/15/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
34
10/15/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
10/22/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
10/24/2018
Judgment
38
10/24/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.